PA HB863 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 26-14)
Status: Passed on June 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-29 - Act No. 75
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending the act of February 19, 1980 (P.L.15, No.9), known as the Real Estate Licensing and Registration Act, in definitions, further providing for definitions; in qualifications and applications for licenses and registration certificates, further providing for qualifications for license; in duties of licensees, further providing for comparative market analysis disclosure and providing for broker price opinion; in Real Estate Recovery Fund, further providing for establishment of the fund; and making related repeals.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In definitions, further providing for definitions; in qualifications and applications for licenses and registration certificates, further providing for qualifications for license; in duties of licensees, further providing for comparative market analysis disclosure and providing for broker price opinion; in Real Estate Recovery Fund, further providing for establishment of the fund; and making related repeals.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-22 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 863 PN 1930, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-21 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-27 - Senate - Senate Consumer Protection And Professional Licensure: Reported as Committed (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-14 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-14 - House - House Floor: HB 863 PN 1930, FP (Y: 182 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - House - House Professional Licensure: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - House - House Professional Licensure: Adopt Amendment A01527 (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-29SenateAct No. 75
2018-06-29SenateApproved by the Governor
2018-06-22SenatePresented to the Governor
2018-06-22SenateSigned in Senate
2018-06-22SenateSigned in House
2018-06-22SenateThird consideration and final passage (49-0)
2018-06-21SenateRe-reported as committed
2018-04-16SenateRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2018-04-16SenateSecond consideration
2018-03-27SenateFirst consideration
2018-03-27SenateReported as committed
2017-06-16SenateReferred to CONSUMER PROTECTION AND PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE
2017-06-14SenateIn the Senate
2017-06-14HouseThird consideration and final passage (182-7)
2017-06-14HouseRe-reported as committed
2017-06-13HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2017-06-13HouseSecond consideration
2017-06-13HouseRe-reported as committed
2017-06-07HouseRe-committed to RULES
2017-06-07HouseFirst consideration
2017-06-07HouseReported as amended
2017-03-16HouseReferred to PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2017&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=863
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0863&pn=0969
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0863&pn=1930
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=34&theDate=06/07/2017&RollCallId=494
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=34&theDate=06/07/2017&RollCallId=495
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=44&theDate=06/13/2017&RollCallId=622
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=496
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=06/14/2017&RollCallId=602
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=7&theDate=03/27/2018&RollCallId=745
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=3&theDate=06/21/2018&RollCallId=1035
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=609

Bill Comments

feedback