PA HB822 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 21-0)
Status: Introduced on March 8 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-11-10 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 8 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-11-10 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
A Joint Resolution proposing an amendment to the Constitution of the Commonwealth of Pennsylvania, providing for an initiative to recall certain elected local officers.
Title
A Joint Resolution proposing an amendment to the Constitution of the Commonwealth of Pennsylvania, providing for an initiative to recall certain elected local officers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-15 - House - House State Government: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 15 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-15 - House - House State Government: Adopt Amendment A01607 (Y: 15 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-15 - House - House State Government: Adopt Amendment A01607 (Y: 15 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-11-10 | House | Laid on the table |
2021-11-10 | House | Removed from table |
2021-09-15 | House | Laid on the table |
2021-09-15 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2021-06-15 | House | Re-committed to RULES |
2021-06-15 | House | First consideration |
2021-06-15 | House | Reported as amended |
2021-03-08 | House | Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT |