PA HB539 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-06 - Referred to CONSUMER PROTECTION AND PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE
Pending: Senate Consumer Protection & Professional Licensure Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-06 - Referred to CONSUMER PROTECTION AND PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE
Pending: Senate Consumer Protection & Professional Licensure Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of April 16, 1992 (P.L.155, No.28), known as the Assessors Certification Act, repealing provisions relating to nonapplicability; and providing for certification.
Title
Repealing provisions relating to nonapplicability; and providing for certification.
Sponsors
Rep. Curtis Thomas [D] | Rep. Vanessa Brown [D] | Rep. Jared Solomon [D] | Rep. Ed Neilson [D] |
Rep. Dominic Costa [D] | Rep. William Kortz [D] | Rep. Nicholas Miccarelli [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-04 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - House - House Floor: HB 539 PN 565, FP (Y: 196 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - House - House Professional Licensure: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - House - House Floor: HB 539 PN 565, FP (Y: 196 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - House - House Professional Licensure: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-06 | Senate | Referred to CONSUMER PROTECTION AND PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE |
2017-04-04 | Senate | In the Senate |
2017-04-04 | House | Third consideration and final passage (196-1) |
2017-04-04 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2017-04-03 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2017-04-03 | House | Second consideration |
2017-03-22 | House | Removed from table |
2017-03-21 | House | Laid on the table |
2017-03-21 | House | First consideration |
2017-03-21 | House | Reported as committed |
2017-02-17 | House | Referred to PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE |