PA HB448 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on November 21 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-12-01 - Referred to CONSUMER PROTECTION AND PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE
Pending: Senate Consumer Protection & Professional Licensure Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending the act of December 4, 1996 (P.L.911, No.147), known as the Telemarketer Registration Act, further providing for unwanted telephone solicitation calls prohibited.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Further providing for unwanted telephone solicitation calls prohibited.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-11-21 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-11-21 - House - House Floor: HB 448 PN 469, FP (Y: 191 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2017-10-18 - House - House Aging And Older Adult Services: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-18 - House - House Consumer Affairs: Re-refer Bill To Another Committee (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-12-01SenateReferred to CONSUMER PROTECTION AND PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE
2017-11-21SenateIn the Senate
2017-11-21HouseThird consideration and final passage (191-0)
2017-11-21HouseRe-reported as committed
2017-11-20HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2017-11-20HouseSecond consideration
2017-10-25HouseRemoved from table
2017-10-18HouseLaid on the table
2017-10-18HouseFirst consideration
2017-10-18HouseReported as committed
2017-04-18HouseRe-referred to AGING AND OLDER ADULT SERVICES
2017-04-18HouseReported with request to re-refer to AGING AND OLDER ADULT SERVICES
2017-02-13HouseReferred to CONSUMER AFFAIRS

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2017&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=448
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0448&pn=0469
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=10&theDate=04/18/2017&RollCallId=227
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=32&theDate=10/18/2017&RollCallId=1029
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=843
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=11/21/2017&RollCallId=1080

Bill Comments

feedback