PA HB349 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 13-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 8 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-22 - Referred to LABOR AND INDUSTRY
Pending: Senate Labor & Industry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 8 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-22 - Referred to LABOR AND INDUSTRY
Pending: Senate Labor & Industry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of November 10, 1999 (P.L.491, No.45), known as the Pennsylvania Construction Code Act, in adoption and enforcement by municipalities, further providing for administration and enforcement.
Title
In adoption and enforcement by municipalities, further providing for administration and enforcement.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-08 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - House - House Floor: HB 349 PN 1129, FP (Y: 114 N: 84 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - House - House Floor: HB 349 PN 1087, 2019 A541, FREEMAN (Y: 88 N: 103 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [FAIL]
2019-03-27 - House - House Floor: HB 349 PN 1087, 2019 A538, HEFFLEY (Y: 191 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - House - House Labor And Industry: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 17 N: 6 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - House - House Labor And Industry: Adopt Amendment (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - House - House Floor: HB 349 PN 1129, FP (Y: 114 N: 84 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - House - House Floor: HB 349 PN 1087, 2019 A541, FREEMAN (Y: 88 N: 103 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [FAIL]
2019-03-27 - House - House Floor: HB 349 PN 1087, 2019 A538, HEFFLEY (Y: 191 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - House - House Labor And Industry: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 17 N: 6 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - House - House Labor And Industry: Adopt Amendment (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-22 | Senate | Referred to LABOR AND INDUSTRY |
2019-04-08 | Senate | In the Senate |
2019-04-08 | House | Third consideration and final passage (114-84) |
2019-04-08 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2019-03-27 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2019-03-27 | House | Second consideration, with amendments |
2019-03-26 | House | Removed from table |
2019-03-25 | House | Laid on the table |
2019-03-25 | House | First consideration |
2019-03-25 | House | Reported as amended |
2019-02-01 | House | Referred to LABOR AND INDUSTRY |