PA HB254 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 14-7)
Status: Passed on July 2 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-02 - Act No. 84
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An Act amending Title 75 (Vehicles) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, further providing for display of registration plate and for learners' permits; providing for automated red light enforcement systems in certain municipalities; and further providing for specific powers of department and local authorities.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Further providing for display of registration plate and for learners' permits; providing for automated red light enforcement systems in certain municipalities; and further providing for specific powers of department and local authorities.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-07-01 - House - HB 254 PN 3874, CONCUR (Y: 113 N: 72 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2012-07-01 - House - HB 254 PN 3874, MOT REV PRIOR PR, VITALI (Y: 52 N: 133 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [FAIL]
2012-07-01 - House - HB 254 PN 3874, MOT MOVE PREV QUESTION, & SUSP RULES TURZAI (Y: 113 N: 72 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2012-07-01 - House - HB 254 PN 3874, MOT TABLE, VITALI (Y: 54 N: 131 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [FAIL]
2012-07-01 - House - HB 254 PN 3874, MOT MOVE PREV QUESTION, TURZAI (Y: 123 N: 62 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2012-06-29 - Senate - HB 254 PN 3874, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 34 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-28 - Senate - HB 254 PN 3443, A12779, PILEGGI AMENDMENT NO. A-12779 (Y: 35 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-25 - Senate - Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-12 - Senate - Reported as Committed (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-02 - House - HB 254 PN 3443, FP (Y: 181 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2012-05-01 - House - HB 254 PN 2963, 2011 A9899, GROVE (Y: 189 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-07-02HouseAct No. 84
2012-07-02HouseApproved by the Governor
2012-07-02HousePresented to the Governor
2012-06-30HouseSigned in Senate
2012-06-30HouseSigned in House
2012-06-30HouseHouse concurred in Senate amendments (113-72)
2012-06-30HouseRe-reported on concurrence, as committed
2012-06-29HouseReferred to RULES
2012-06-29HouseIn the House
2012-06-29SenateThird consideration and final passage (34-15)
2012-06-28SenateAmended on third consideration
2012-06-25SenateRe-reported as committed
2012-06-18SenateRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2012-06-13SenateSecond consideration
2012-06-12SenateFirst consideration
2012-06-12SenateReported as committed
2012-05-11SenateReferred to TRANSPORTATION
2012-05-02SenateIn the Senate
2012-05-02HouseThird consideration and final passage (181-1)
2012-05-02HouseRe-reported as committed
2012-05-01HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2012-05-01HouseSecond consideration, with amendments
2012-04-30HouseRemoved from table
2012-03-27HouseLaid on the table
2012-03-27HouseRemoved from table
2012-01-18HouseLaid on the table
2012-01-18HouseFirst consideration
2012-01-18HouseReported as amended
2011-01-26HouseReferred to TRANSPORTATION

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2011&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=254
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=HTM&sessYr=2011&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0254&pn=0205
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=HTM&sessYr=2011&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0254&pn=2963
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=HTM&sessYr=2011&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0254&pn=3443
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=HTM&sessYr=2011&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0254&pn=3874
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2011&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1333
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2011&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1365
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2011&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=19&theDate=06/12/2012&rNbr=1047
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2011&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=3&theDate=06/25/2012&rNbr=1118
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2011&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=752
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2011&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=760
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2011&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1820
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2011&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1821
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2011&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1822
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2011&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1823
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2011&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1824

Bill Comments

feedback