PA HB2154 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-7)
Status: Introduced on December 9 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-24 - Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 9 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-24 - Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An Act amending the act of May 17, 1921 (P.L.682, No.284), known as The Insurance Company Law of 1921, further providing for immunity from liability; and making a related repeal.
Title
Further providing for immunity from liability; and making a related repeal.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-24 | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS | |
2010-03-24 | Removed from table | |
2010-03-23 | Laid on the table | |
2010-03-23 | First consideration | |
2010-03-23 | Reported as amended | |
2009-12-09 | Referred to INSURANCE |