PA HB2066 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Introduced on March 10 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-10-07 - Removed from table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 10 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-10-07 - Removed from table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of July 14, 1961 (P.L.637, No.329), known as the Wage Payment and Collection Law, expanding the scope of the act.
Title
Expanding the scope of the act.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-10-07 | House | Removed from table |
2014-10-07 | House | Laid on the table |
2014-06-29 | House | Removed from table |
2014-06-29 | House | Laid on the table |
2014-06-03 | House | Removed from table |
2014-04-29 | House | Laid on the table |
2014-04-29 | House | First consideration |
2014-04-29 | House | Reported as amended |
2014-03-10 | House | Referred to LABOR AND INDUSTRY |