PA HB1929 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 28-10)
Status: Passed on June 22 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-22 - Act No. 42
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending the act of April 9, 1929 (P.L.343, No.176), known as The Fiscal Code, implementing the 2018-2019 Commonwealth budget and instituting future budget implementation: Further providing for title of act; in cigarette sales and licensing; further providing for preemption; In Treasury Department: providing for Keystone Scholars Grant Program; In disposition of abandoned and unclaimed property: further providing for property held by business associations; In procedure for the disbursement of money from the State Treasury: further providing for settlement agreements and enforcement; In capital facilities: further providing for applications; providing for entertainment business financial management firms; In tax credits: further providing for Department of Community and Economic Development; In Business in Our Sites Program Account: further providing for transfers of funds; providing for private dam financial assurance; In special funds: further providing for Budget Stabilization Reserve Fund funding and for other grants relating to Pennsylvania Gaming Economic Development and Tourism Fund; In additional special funds: further providing for use of Tobacco Settlement Fund, for distributions from Pennsylvania Race Horse Development Fund and for drug and alcohol programs; providing for Natural Gas Infrastructure Development Fund grant agreements; and further providing for use of First Chance Trust Fund; In general budget implementation: providing for Independent Fiscal Office revenue estimates; further providing for Attorney General, for Department of Conservation and Natural Resources, for Department of Health, for Department of Labor and Industry, for Department of Revenue and for surcharges; providing for deposit into School Safety and Security Fund and further providing for Multimodal Transportation Fund; In school district debt refinancing bonds: further providing for sinking fund charges for school building; providing for reinstatement of item vetoes; repealing provisions relating to 2013-2014 budget implementation and 2013-2014 restrictions on appropriations for funds and accounts; providing for 2018-2019 budget implementation and 2018-2019 restrictions on appropriations for funds and accounts; and making related repeals.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Implementing the 2018-2019 Commonwealth budget and instituting future budget implementation: Further providing for title of act; in cigarette sales and licensing; further providing for preemption; In Treasury Department: providing for Keystone Scholars Grant Program; In disposition of abandoned and unclaimed property: further providing for property held by business associations; In procedure for the disbursement of money from the State Treasury: further providing for settlement agreements and enforcement; In capital facilities: further providing for applications; providing for entertainment business financial management firms; In tax credits: further providing for Department of Community and Economic Development; In Business in Our Sites Program Account: further providing for transfers of funds; providing for private dam financial assurance; In special funds: further providing for Budget Stabilization Reserve Fund funding and for other grants relating to Pennsylvania Gaming Economic Development and Tourism Fund; In additional special funds: further providing for use of Tobacco Settlement Fund, for distributions from Pennsylvania Race Horse Development Fund and for drug and alcohol programs; providing for Natural Gas Infrastructure Development Fund grant agreements; and further providing for use of First Chance Trust Fund; In general budget implementation: providing for Independent Fiscal Office revenue estimates; further providing for Attorney General, for Department of Conservation and Natural Resources, for Department of Health, for Department of Labor and Industry, for Department of Revenue and for surcharges; providing for deposit into School Safety and Security Fund and further providing for Multimodal Transportation Fund; In school district debt refinancing bonds: further providing for sinking fund charges for school building; providing for reinstatement of item vetoes; repealing provisions relating to 2013-2014 budget implementation and 2013-2014 restrictions on appropriations for funds and accounts; providing for 2018-2019 budget implementation and 2018-2019 restrictions on appropriations for funds and accounts; and making related repeals.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-22 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-22 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 1929 PN 3810, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 44 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-22 - House - House Floor: HB 1929 PN 3810, CONCUR (Y: 171 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2018-06-22 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Amended (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Reported as Amended (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-06 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-06 - House - House Floor: HB 1929 PN 2722, FP (Y: 187 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2017-11-21 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-22HouseAct No. 42
2018-06-22HouseApproved by the Governor
2018-06-22HousePresented to the Governor
2018-06-22HouseSigned in Senate
2018-06-22HouseSigned in House
2018-06-22HouseHouse concurred in Senate amendments (171-22)
2018-06-22HouseRe-reported on concurrence, as committed
2018-06-22HouseReferred to RULES
2018-06-22HouseIn the House
2018-06-22SenateThird consideration and final passage (44-5)
2018-06-22SenateRe-reported as amended
2018-06-19SenateRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2018-06-19SenateSecond consideration
2018-06-18SenateFirst consideration
2018-06-18SenateReported as amended
2017-12-08SenateReferred to JUDICIARY
2017-12-06SenateIn the Senate
2017-12-06HouseThird consideration and final passage (187-0)
2017-12-06HouseRe-reported as committed
2017-12-05HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2017-12-05HouseSecond consideration
2017-12-04HouseRemoved from table
2017-11-21HouseLaid on the table
2017-11-21HouseFirst consideration
2017-11-21HouseReported as committed
2017-11-17HouseReferred to JUDICIARY

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2017&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=1929
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1929&pn=2722
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1929&pn=3731
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1929&pn=3810
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=24&theDate=11/21/2017&RollCallId=1078
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=885
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=12/06/2017&RollCallId=1128
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=39&theDate=06/18/2018&RollCallId=974
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=3&theDate=06/22/2018&RollCallId=1044
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1434
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=623
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=44&theDate=06/22/2018&RollCallId=1858

Bill Comments

feedback