PA HB159 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 10-5)
Status: Passed on June 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-28 - Act No. 49
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 10-5)
Status: Passed on June 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-28 - Act No. 49
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 42 (Judiciary and Judicial Procedure) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in juvenile matters, further providing for definitions, for summary offenses and for adjudication.
Title
In juvenile matters, further providing for definitions, for summary offenses and for adjudication.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-22 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-22 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 159 PN 3607, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-22 - House - House Floor: HB 159 PN 3607, CONCUR (Y: 192 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2018-06-05 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Reported as Amended (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - House - House Floor: HB 159 PN 123, FP (Y: 200 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-01-25 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-22 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 159 PN 3607, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-22 - House - House Floor: HB 159 PN 3607, CONCUR (Y: 192 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2018-06-05 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Reported as Amended (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - House - House Floor: HB 159 PN 123, FP (Y: 200 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-01-25 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-28 | House | Act No. 49 |
2018-06-28 | House | Approved by the Governor |
2018-06-27 | House | Presented to the Governor |
2018-06-27 | House | Signed in Senate |
2018-06-25 | House | Signed in House |
2018-06-22 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments (192-1) |
2018-06-22 | House | Re-reported on concurrence, as committed |
2018-06-22 | House | Referred to RULES |
2018-06-22 | House | In the House |
2018-06-22 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (49-0) |
2018-06-11 | Senate | Second consideration |
2018-06-05 | Senate | First consideration |
2018-06-05 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Referred to JUDICIARY |
2017-02-07 | Senate | In the Senate |
2017-02-07 | House | Third consideration and final passage (200-0) |
2017-02-07 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2017-02-06 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2017-02-06 | House | Second consideration |
2017-01-25 | House | Removed from table |
2017-01-25 | House | Laid on the table |
2017-01-25 | House | First consideration |
2017-01-25 | House | Reported as committed |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to JUDICIARY |