PA HB112 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 16-9)
Status: Engrossed on February 7 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-15 - Referred to TRANSPORTATION
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 7 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-15 - Referred to TRANSPORTATION
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act designating a bridge on that portion of State Route 2014 over Lycoming Creek, City of Williamsport, Lycoming County, as the Alexander M. McFadden Memorial Bridge.
Title
Designating a bridge on that portion of State Route 2014 over Lycoming Creek, City of Williamsport, Lycoming County, as the Alexander M. McFadden Memorial Bridge.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-07 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - House - House Floor: HB 112 PN 88, FP (Y: 200 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-01-25 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - House - House Floor: HB 112 PN 88, FP (Y: 200 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-01-25 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-15 | Senate | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |
2017-02-07 | Senate | In the Senate |
2017-02-07 | House | Third consideration and final passage (200-0) |
2017-02-07 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2017-02-06 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2017-02-06 | House | Second consideration |
2017-01-25 | House | Removed from table |
2017-01-25 | House | Laid on the table |
2017-01-25 | House | First consideration |
2017-01-25 | House | Reported as committed |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |