OR SB90 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on July 2 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-02 - Effective date, June 24, 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on July 2 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-02 - Effective date, June 24, 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Modifies certification system for shorthand reporters.
Title
Relating to shorthand reporters; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-02 | Senate | Effective date, June 24, 2013. |
2013-07-02 | Senate | Chapter 470, 2013 Laws. |
2013-06-24 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2013-06-18 | House | Speaker signed. |
2013-06-17 | Senate | President signed. |
2013-06-12 | House | Third reading. Carried by Barton. Passed. Ayes, 45; Nays, 14--Cameron, Davis, Freeman, Gilliam, Hanna, Hicks, Huffman, Johnson, Parrish, Sprenger, Thatcher, Weidner, Whisnant, Whitsett; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Buckley. |
2013-06-11 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to June 12, 2013 Calendar. |
2013-06-10 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to June 11, 2013 Calendar. |
2013-06-06 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to June 10, 2013 Calendar. |
2013-06-05 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to June 6, 2013 Calendar. |
2013-06-04 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to June 5, 2013 Calendar. |
2013-06-03 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to June 4, 2013 Calendar. |
2013-05-30 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to June 3, 2013 Calendar. |
2013-05-29 | House | Second reading. |
2013-05-28 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2013-05-22 | House | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2013-05-01 | House | Referred to Judiciary. |
2013-04-30 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2013-04-29 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Roblan. Passed. Ayes, 23; nays, 6--Baertschiger, Boquist, Girod, Olsen, Thomsen, Whitsett; excused, 1--Johnson. |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Second reading. |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2013-01-18 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary. |
2013-01-14 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |