OR SB835 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Enrolled on June 25 2013 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-07-02 - Governor signed.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on June 25 2013 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-07-02 - Governor signed.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
States that conducting of or participation in rodeos is permitted in state.
Title
Relating to activities that involve livestock.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-02 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2013-07-01 | House | Speaker signed. |
2013-06-28 | Senate | President signed. |
2013-06-27 | Senate | Close granted unanimous consent to correct record to reflect Aye vote. |
2013-06-27 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments and repassed bill. Ayes, 24; nays, 6--Baertschiger, Ferrioli, Girod, Kruse, Olsen, Whitsett. |
2013-06-25 | House | Third reading. Carried by Gomberg. Passed. Ayes, 57; Nays, 1--Whitsett; Excused, 1--Unger; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Bailey. |
2013-06-24 | House | Second reading. |
2013-06-24 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2013-06-20 | House | Work Session held. |
2013-06-05 | House | Referred to Rules by order of Speaker. |
2013-06-05 | House | Without recommendation as to passage and be referred to Rules. |
2013-05-30 | House | Work Session held. |
2013-05-13 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2013-05-08 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2013-04-24 | House | Referred to Judiciary. |
2013-04-17 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Hass,Hansell. Passed. Ayes, 22; nays, 6--Baertschiger, Ferrioli, Girod, Kruse, Olsen, Whitsett; excused, 2--Boquist, Steiner Hayward. |
2013-04-15 | Senate | Second reading. |
2013-04-15 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Referred to Environment and Natural Resources. |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |