OR SB834 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 13-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-02 - Effective date, June 24, 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 13-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-02 - Effective date, June 24, 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Increases penalty for crime of initiating false report to maximum of one year's imprisonment, $6,250 fine, or both.
Title
Relating to initiating a false report; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-02 | Senate | Effective date, June 24, 2013. |
2013-07-02 | Senate | Chapter 490, 2013 Laws. |
2013-06-24 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2013-06-18 | House | Speaker signed. |
2013-06-17 | Senate | President signed. |
2013-06-13 | House | Third reading. Carried by Barker. Passed. Ayes, 58; Excused, 1--Dembrow; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Speaker Kotek. |
2013-06-12 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to June 13, 2013 Calendar. |
2013-06-11 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to June 12, 2013 Calendar. |
2013-06-10 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to June 11, 2013 Calendar. |
2013-06-06 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to June 10, 2013 Calendar. |
2013-06-05 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to June 6, 2013 Calendar. |
2013-06-04 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to June 5, 2013 Calendar. |
2013-06-03 | House | Second reading. |
2013-05-30 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2013-05-23 | House | Work Session held. |
2013-05-09 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2013-04-30 | House | Referred to Judiciary. |
2013-04-25 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Winters. Passed. Ayes, 29; excused, 1--Johnson. |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Taken from 04-23 Calendar and placed on 04-24 Calendar on voice vote. |
2013-04-22 | Senate | Second reading. |
2013-04-22 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary. |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |