OR SB680 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Failed on July 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-08 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Failed on July 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-08 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that certain persons may seek contribution from persons who have resolved liability to state in administrative or judicially approved settlement.
Title
Relating to claims for contribution.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-08 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary. |
2013-02-26 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |