OR SB678 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 28-10)
Status: Passed on July 2 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-02 - Effective date, June 24, 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 28-10)
Status: Passed on July 2 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-02 - Effective date, June 24, 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Extends exclusive remedy protections of workers' compensation statutes to partners, limited liability company members, general partners, limited liability partners and limited partners.
Title
Relating to exclusive remedy protections of workers' compensation statutes; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-02 | Senate | Effective date, June 24, 2013. |
2013-07-02 | Senate | Chapter 488, 2013 Laws. |
2013-06-24 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2013-06-18 | House | Speaker signed. |
2013-06-17 | Senate | President signed. |
2013-06-12 | House | Third reading. Carried by Witt. Passed. Ayes, 59; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Buckley. |
2013-06-11 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to June 12, 2013 Calendar. |
2013-06-10 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to June 11, 2013 Calendar. |
2013-06-06 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to June 10, 2013 Calendar. |
2013-06-05 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to June 6, 2013 Calendar. |
2013-06-04 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to June 5, 2013 Calendar. |
2013-06-03 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to June 4, 2013 Calendar. |
2013-05-30 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to June 3, 2013 Calendar. |
2013-05-29 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 30, 2013 Calendar. |
2013-05-28 | House | Second reading. |
2013-05-24 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2013-05-22 | House | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2013-05-08 | House | Referred to Business and Labor. |
2013-05-01 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Thomsen. Passed. Ayes, 28; excused, 2--Johnson, Whitsett. |
2013-04-29 | Senate | Second reading. |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Referred to Business and Transportation. |
2013-02-26 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |