OR SB5537 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on July 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-03 - Effective date, July 1, 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on July 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-03 - Effective date, July 1, 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Limits certain biennial expenditures from fees, moneys or other revenues, including Miscellaneous Receipts, but excluding lottery funds and federal funds, collected or received by Public Employees Retirement System.
Title
Relating to the financial administration of the Public Employees Retirement System; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-03 | Senate | Effective date, July 1, 2013. |
2013-07-03 | Senate | Chapter 548, 2013 Laws. |
2013-06-26 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2013-06-20 | House | Speaker signed. |
2013-06-20 | Senate | President signed. |
2013-06-19 | House | Third reading. Carried by Gomberg. Passed. Ayes, 55; Nays, 4--Parrish, Thatcher, Weidner, Whitsett; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Buckley. |
2013-06-18 | House | Second reading. |
2013-06-17 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2013-06-14 | House | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2013-06-14 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2013-06-13 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Whitsett. Passed. Ayes, 28; nays, 2--Boquist, George. |
2013-06-12 | Senate | Second reading. |
2013-06-11 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2013-06-06 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2013-05-30 | Senate | Returned to Full Committee. |
2013-05-30 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2013-03-06 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2013-03-04 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2013-01-23 | Senate | Assigned to Subcommittee On General Government. |
2013-01-16 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2013-01-14 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |