OR SB5508 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on July 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-03 - Effective date, July 1, 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on July 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-03 - Effective date, July 1, 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Limits biennial expenditures from fees, moneys or other revenues, including Miscellaneous Receipts, but excluding lottery funds and federal funds, collected or received by State Board of Chiropractic Examiners.
Title
Relating to the financial administration of the State Board of Chiropractic Examiners; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-03 | Senate | Effective date, July 1, 2013. |
2013-07-03 | Senate | Chapter 543, 2013 Laws. |
2013-06-26 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2013-06-21 | House | Speaker signed. |
2013-06-20 | Senate | President signed. |
2013-06-17 | House | Vote explanation(s) filed by Bailey. |
2013-06-17 | House | Third reading. Carried by Komp. Passed. Ayes, 36; Nays, 22--Bailey, Barton, Bentz, Berger, Cameron, Davis, Esquivel, Freeman, Gilliam, Hanna, Hicks, Johnson, Krieger, McLane, Olson, Read, Sprenger, Thatcher, Unger, Weidner, Whisnant, Whitsett; Excused, 2--Harker, Jenson. |
2013-06-14 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to June 17, 2013 Calendar. |
2013-06-13 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to June 14, 2013 Calendar. |
2013-06-12 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to June 13, 2013 Calendar. |
2013-06-11 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to June 12, 2013 Calendar. |
2013-06-10 | House | Second reading. |
2013-06-06 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2013-06-05 | House | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2013-06-05 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2013-06-04 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Monroe. Passed. Ayes, 21; nays, 9--Baertschiger, Boquist, Close, Ferrioli, Hansell, Kruse, Olsen, Thomsen, Whitsett. |
2013-06-03 | Senate | Second reading. |
2013-06-03 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2013-05-24 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Returned to Full Committee. |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2013-01-23 | Senate | Assigned to Subcommittee On Education. |
2013-01-16 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2013-01-14 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |