OR SB5502 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on July 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-03 - Effective date, July 1, 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on July 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-03 - Effective date, July 1, 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates moneys from General Fund to State Department of Agriculture for certain biennial expenses.
Title
Relating to the financial administration of the State Department of Agriculture; appropriating money; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-03 | Senate | Effective date, July 1, 2013. |
2013-07-03 | Senate | Chapter 540, 2013 Laws. |
2013-06-26 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2013-06-20 | House | Speaker signed. |
2013-06-20 | Senate | President signed. |
2013-06-19 | House | Third reading. Carried by Unger. Passed. Ayes, 49; Nays, 9--Barton, Cameron, Freeman, Gilliam, Hanna, Hicks, Thatcher, Weidner, Whitsett; Excused for Business of the House, 2--Buckley, Hoyle. |
2013-06-18 | House | Second reading. |
2013-06-17 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2013-06-14 | House | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2013-06-14 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2013-06-13 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Edwards. Passed. Ayes, 29; excused, 1--Boquist. |
2013-06-12 | Senate | Second reading. |
2013-06-11 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2013-06-06 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2013-06-04 | Senate | Returned to Full Committee. |
2013-06-04 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2013-04-29 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2013-02-27 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2013-02-26 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2013-02-25 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2013-01-23 | Senate | Assigned to Subcommittee On Natural Resources. |
2013-01-16 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2013-01-14 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |