OR SB54 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on June 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-10 - Effective date, January 1, 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on June 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-10 - Effective date, January 1, 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Allows Oregon Department of Aviation to impose civil penalty for violations related to landing places for aircraft.
Title
Relating to enforcement of laws regarding landing places for aircraft.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2019-05-22 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 47 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 23 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 23 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-10 | Senate | Effective date, January 1, 2020. |
2019-06-10 | Senate | Chapter 226, 2019 Laws. |
2019-06-04 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2019-05-28 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-05-28 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-05-22 | House | Third reading. Carried by Evans. Passed. Ayes, 47; Nays, 10--Barreto, Leif, McLane, Nearman, Post, Reschke, Sprenger, Stark, Wilson, Zika; Excused, 2--Boles, Helm; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Speaker Kotek. |
2019-05-21 | House | Carried over to May 22, 2019 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2019-05-20 | House | Carried over to May 21, 2019 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2019-05-17 | House | Carried over to May 20, 2019 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2019-05-16 | House | Carried over to May 17, 2019 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2019-05-15 | House | Carried over to May 16, 2019 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2019-05-14 | House | Carried over to May 15, 2019 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2019-05-13 | House | Carried over to May 14, 2019 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2019-05-09 | House | Carried over to May 13, 2019 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2019-05-08 | House | Carried over to May 9, 2019 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2019-05-07 | House | Second reading. |
2019-05-06 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2019-05-01 | House | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2019-02-11 | House | Referred to Transportation. |
2019-02-04 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Girod. Passed. Ayes, 23; Nays, 6--Bentz, Boquist, Heard, Linthicum, Olsen, Thatcher; Excused, 1--Thomsen. |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Second reading. |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2019-01-15 | Senate | Referred to Business and General Government. |
2019-01-14 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |