OR SB536 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on July 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-03 - Effective date, January 1, 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on July 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-03 - Effective date, January 1, 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Permits state agency to locate, on premises that state agency owns or controls, devices or facilities to deliver electricity to public for motor vehicles that use electricity for propulsion and contract with vendor that will distribute, dispense or make available electricity from devices or facilities.
Title
Relating to state provision of energy for motor vehicles.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-03 | Senate | Effective date, January 1, 2014. |
2013-07-03 | Senate | Chapter 526, 2013 Laws. |
2013-06-26 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2013-06-20 | House | Speaker signed. |
2013-06-20 | Senate | President signed. |
2013-06-19 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments and repassed bill. Ayes, 27; nays, 2--Kruse, Whitsett; excused, 1--Johnson. |
2013-06-14 | House | Potential conflict(s) of interest declared by Cameron. |
2013-06-14 | House | Third reading. Carried by Lively. Passed. Ayes, 44; Nays, 15--Esquivel, Freeman, Gilliam, Hanna, Hicks, Johnson, Kennemer, Krieger, Olson, Sprenger, Thatcher, Thompson, Weidner, Whisnant, Whitsett; Excused, 1--Bailey. |
2013-06-13 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to June 14, 2013 Calendar. |
2013-06-12 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to June 13, 2013 Calendar. |
2013-06-11 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to June 12, 2013 Calendar. |
2013-06-10 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to June 11, 2013 Calendar. |
2013-06-06 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to June 10, 2013 Calendar. |
2013-06-05 | House | Second reading. |
2013-06-04 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed B-Engrossed. |
2013-05-30 | House | Work Session held. |
2013-04-29 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2013-04-16 | House | Referred to Transportation and Economic Development. |
2013-04-09 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Dingfelder. Passed. Ayes, 23; nays, 2--Kruse, Whitsett; excused, 5--Baertschiger, Bates, Devlin, Ferrioli, Olsen. |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Second reading. |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2013-03-27 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2013-02-18 | Senate | Referred to Environment and Natural Resources. |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |