OR SB528 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 2 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-02 - Effective date, June 24, 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 2 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-02 - Effective date, June 24, 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Allows Secretary of State, State Treasurer, judicial department and legislative department to obtain copyrights and patents on data processing materials and to sell, lease or otherwise make available the materials to local, state and federal governmental bodies.
Title
Relating to state data processing development; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-02 | Senate | Effective date, June 24, 2013. |
2013-07-02 | Senate | Chapter 481, 2013 Laws. |
2013-06-24 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2013-06-18 | House | Speaker signed. |
2013-06-17 | Senate | President signed. |
2013-06-12 | House | Third reading. Carried by Harker. Passed. Ayes, 50; Nays, 9--Esquivel, Freeman, Hanna, Hicks, Krieger, McLane, Thatcher, Weidner, Whisnant; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Buckley. |
2013-06-11 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to June 12, 2013 Calendar. |
2013-06-10 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to June 11, 2013 Calendar. |
2013-06-06 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to June 10, 2013 Calendar. |
2013-06-05 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to June 6, 2013 Calendar. |
2013-06-04 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to June 5, 2013 Calendar. |
2013-06-03 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to June 4, 2013 Calendar. |
2013-05-30 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to June 3, 2013 Calendar. |
2013-05-29 | House | Second reading. |
2013-05-28 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2013-05-22 | House | Work Session held. |
2013-05-14 | House | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2013-03-27 | House | Referred to Revenue. |
2013-03-21 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Steiner Hayward. Passed. Ayes, 30. |
2013-03-18 | Senate | Second reading. |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2013-03-11 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2013-02-18 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary. |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |