OR SB40 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on July 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-03 - Effective date, July 1, 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on July 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-03 - Effective date, July 1, 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Defines "marijuana" and "marijuana product."
Title
Relating to classification of controlled substance offenses; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-03 | Senate | Effective date, July 1, 2013. |
2013-07-03 | Senate | Chapter 591, 2013 Laws. |
2013-07-01 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2013-06-27 | House | Speaker signed. |
2013-06-26 | Senate | President signed. |
2013-06-25 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments and repassed bill. Ayes, 20; nays, 10--Boquist, Close, Ferrioli, Girod, Hansell, Johnson, Knopp, Olsen, Thomsen, Whitsett. |
2013-06-21 | House | Third reading. Carried by Williamson. Passed. Ayes, 43; Nays, 16--Bentz, Freeman, Gallegos, Gilliam, Hicks, Johnson, Kennemer, Parrish, Smith, Sprenger, Thatcher, Thompson, Unger, Weidner, Whisnant, Whitsett; Excused, 1--Hanna. |
2013-06-20 | House | Second reading. |
2013-06-20 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2013-06-19 | House | Work Session held. |
2013-06-12 | House | Returned to Full Committee. |
2013-06-12 | House | Work Session held. |
2013-06-10 | House | Assigned to Subcommittee On Public Safety. |
2013-06-05 | House | Referred to Ways and Means by order of Speaker. |
2013-06-05 | House | Without recommendation as to passage, with amendments, be printed B-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means. |
2013-05-29 | House | Work Session held. |
2013-05-23 | House | Work Session held. |
2013-05-20 | House | Work Session held. |
2013-05-13 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2013-04-30 | House | Referred to Judiciary. |
2013-04-25 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Kruse. Passed. Ayes, 22; nays, 7--Close, Girod, Hansell, Knopp, Olsen, Thomsen, Whitsett; excused, 1--Johnson. |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Second reading. |
2013-04-22 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2013-02-26 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2013-01-18 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary. |
2013-01-14 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |