OR SB322 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Failed on July 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-06 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Failed on July 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-06 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes funding mechanism for fifth year high school programs. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to fifth year high school programs; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Sen. Mark Hass [D] | Sen. Alan Bates [D] | Sen. Arnie Roblan [D] | Rep. Tobias Read [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-06 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Referred to Education, then Ways and Means. |
2015-01-12 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2015R1/Measures/Overview/SB322 |
Text | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2015R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB322/Introduced |