OR SB319 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on July 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-08 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on July 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-08 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Extends sunset for tax credit for contributions to Trust for Cultural Development.
Title
Relating to tax credits for contributions to Trust for Cultural Development.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-08 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass and be referred to Tax Credits by prior reference. |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Referred to Business and Transportation, then Tax Credits. |
2013-01-14 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |