OR SB302 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on July 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-08 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on July 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-08 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Transfers duties, functions and powers relating to issuance of authorizations and enforcement and certain other duties, functions and powers, from State Board of Psychologist Examiners, Occupational Therapy Licensing Board, State Board of Licensed Social Workers, Oregon Board of Licensed Professional Counselors and Therapists, State Board of Examiners for Speech-Language Pathology and Audiology, State Board of Chiropractic Examiners, Oregon Board of Naturopathic Medicine?
Title
Relating to the Oregon Health Licensing Agency; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-08 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2013-01-16 | Senate | Referred to Health Care and Human Services, then Ways and Means. |
2013-01-14 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |