OR SB288 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-02 - Effective date, January 1, 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-02 - Effective date, January 1, 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Eliminates requirement that person with limited vision condition take driver test every two years.
Title
Relating to persons with limited vision condition.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-02 | Senate | Effective date, January 1, 2014. |
2013-07-02 | Senate | Chapter 473, 2013 Laws. |
2013-06-24 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2013-06-18 | House | Speaker signed. |
2013-06-17 | Senate | President signed. |
2013-06-13 | House | Third reading. Carried by Doherty. Passed. Ayes, 58; Excused, 1--Dembrow; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Speaker Kotek. |
2013-06-12 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to June 13, 2013 Calendar. |
2013-06-11 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to June 12, 2013 Calendar. |
2013-06-10 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to June 11, 2013 Calendar. |
2013-06-06 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to June 10, 2013 Calendar. |
2013-06-05 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to June 6, 2013 Calendar. |
2013-06-04 | House | Second reading. |
2013-06-03 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2013-05-29 | House | Work Session held. |
2013-04-22 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2013-03-06 | House | Referred to Transportation and Economic Development. |
2013-03-04 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Boquist. Passed. Ayes, 28; excused, 2--Monroe, Roblan. |
2013-02-26 | Senate | Second reading. |
2013-02-26 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2013-01-16 | Senate | Referred to Business and Transportation. |
2013-01-14 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |