OR SB276 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes product stewardship program for mattresses. Establishes Mattress Stewardship Fund. Establishes mattress stewardship program advisory committee. Becomes operative January 1, 2020. Requires stewardship organizations to submit initial] plans for mattress stewardship programs to be submitted] to Department of Environmental Quality no later than April 1, 2021. Provides that mattress stewardship program developed pursuant to approved plan may first be implemented no earlier than January 1, 2022]. Imposes civil penalty] penalties for violation of program provisions not to exceed $25,000], per day for each day of violation, $100 for violation by retailer, $1,000 for violation by producer or renovator and $1,000 for violation by stewardship organization. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to mattresses; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-09 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments and requesting referral to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Engrossed.) (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-30 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means by order of the President. |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2019-01-15 | Senate | Referred to Environment and Natural Resources. |
2019-01-14 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |