OR SB276 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on July 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-06 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on July 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-06 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Applies licensing requirements and other obligations on buy-here-pay-here lenders that are similar to requirements to which payday lenders and title lenders are subject. Enables Director of Consumer and Business Services to enforce requirements with cease and desist order or by imposing civil penalty. Becomes operative January 1, 2016. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to certain consumer loans; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-06 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Referred to Business and Transportation. |
2015-01-12 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2015R1/Measures/Overview/SB276 |
Text | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2015R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB276/Introduced |