OR SB276 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on May 19 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-19 - Effective date, May 19, 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on May 19 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-19 - Effective date, May 19, 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to health care for veterans; and declaring an emergency.
Title
Relating to health care for veterans; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-19 | Effective date, May 19, 2011. | |
2011-05-19 | Chapter 81, 2011 Laws. | |
2011-05-19 | Governor signed. | |
2011-05-12 | Co-Speakers signed. | |
2011-05-10 | President signed. | |
2011-05-09 | Third reading. Carried by Boone. Passed. Ayes, 53; Excused, 7--Buckley, Cameron, Hunt, Richardson, Smith G., Speaker Hanna, Speaker Roblan. | |
2011-05-05 | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 9, 2011 Calendar. | |
2011-05-04 | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 5, 2011 Calendar. | |
2011-05-03 | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 4, 2011 Calendar. | |
2011-05-02 | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 3, 2011 Calendar. | |
2011-04-29 | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 2, 2011 Calendar. | |
2011-04-28 | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 29, 2011 Calendar. | |
2011-04-27 | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 28, 2011 Calendar. | |
2011-04-26 | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 27, 2011 Calendar. | |
2011-04-25 | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 26, 2011 Calendar. | |
2011-04-21 | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 25, 2011 Calendar. | |
2011-04-20 | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 21, 2011 Calendar. | |
2011-04-19 | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 20, 2011 Calendar. | |
2011-04-18 | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 19, 2011 Calendar. | |
2011-04-14 | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 18, 2011 Calendar. | |
2011-04-13 | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 14, 2011 Calendar. | |
2011-04-12 | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 13, 2011 Calendar. | |
2011-04-11 | Second reading. | |
2011-04-08 | Recommendation: Do pass. | |
2011-04-05 | Work Session held. | |
2011-03-29 | Public Hearing held. | |
2011-03-07 | Referred to Veterans Affairs. | |
2011-02-28 | First reading. Referred to the desks of the Co-Speakers. | |
2011-02-24 | Third reading. Carried by Boquist. Passed. Ayes, 30. | |
2011-02-22 | Second reading. | |
2011-02-22 | Recommendation: Do pass. | |
2011-02-16 | Work Session held. | |
2011-02-09 | Public Hearing held. | |
2011-01-14 | Referred to Veterans' and Military Affairs. | |
2011-01-10 | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |