OR SB255 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on July 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-08 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on July 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-08 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Permits taxpayer to defer recognition of long-term capital gain if taxpayer makes contribution to Innovation Development Fund.
Title
Relating to investment in innovation; appropriating money; prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-08 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2013-01-18 | Senate | Referred to Business and Transportation, then Finance and Revenue. |
2013-01-14 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |