OR SB254 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on July 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-03 - Effective date, June 26, 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on July 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-03 - Effective date, June 26, 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Specifies conditions under which contracting agency may use alternative contracting method to award public improvement contract for construction manager/general contractor services.
Title
Relating to requirements for alternative contracting methods; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-03 | Senate | Effective date, June 26, 2013. |
2013-07-03 | Senate | Chapter 522, 2013 Laws. |
2013-06-26 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2013-06-21 | House | Speaker signed. |
2013-06-20 | Senate | President signed. |
2013-06-18 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments and repassed bill. Ayes, 30. |
2013-06-13 | House | Third reading. Carried by Holvey. Passed. Ayes, 58; Excused, 1--Dembrow; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Speaker Kotek. |
2013-06-12 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to June 13, 2013 Calendar. |
2013-06-11 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to June 12, 2013 Calendar. |
2013-06-10 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to June 11, 2013 Calendar. |
2013-06-06 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to June 10, 2013 Calendar. |
2013-06-05 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to June 6, 2013 Calendar. |
2013-06-04 | House | Second reading. |
2013-06-03 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed B-Engrossed. |
2013-05-30 | House | Work Session held. |
2013-05-09 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2013-04-30 | House | Referred to Consumer Protection and Government Efficiency. |
2013-04-25 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Beyer. Passed. Ayes, 29; excused, 1--Johnson. |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Second reading. |
2013-04-22 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2013-02-25 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2013-01-16 | Senate | Referred to Business and Transportation. |
2013-01-14 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |