OR SB184 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on July 2 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-02 - Effective date, June 24, 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on July 2 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-02 - Effective date, June 24, 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Allows notice of garnishment to be served by first class mail or, in certain circumstances, by other methods.
Title
Relating to notices of garnishment; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-02 | Senate | Effective date, June 24, 2013. |
2013-07-02 | Senate | Chapter 472, 2013 Laws. |
2013-06-24 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2013-06-18 | House | Speaker signed. |
2013-06-17 | Senate | President signed. |
2013-06-12 | House | Third reading. Carried by Davis. Passed. Ayes, 59; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Buckley. |
2013-06-11 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to June 12, 2013 Calendar. |
2013-06-10 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to June 11, 2013 Calendar. |
2013-06-06 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to June 10, 2013 Calendar. |
2013-06-05 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to June 6, 2013 Calendar. |
2013-06-04 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to June 5, 2013 Calendar. |
2013-06-03 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to June 4, 2013 Calendar. |
2013-05-30 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to June 3, 2013 Calendar. |
2013-05-29 | House | Second reading. |
2013-05-28 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2013-05-21 | House | Work Session held. |
2013-05-14 | House | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2013-03-05 | House | Referred to Revenue. |
2013-02-27 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2013-02-26 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by George. Passed. Ayes, 28; excused, 2--Monroe, Shields. |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Second reading. |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2013-02-18 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass and be referred to Finance and Revenue by prior reference. |
2013-02-07 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2013-01-18 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary, then Finance and Revenue. |
2013-01-14 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |