OR HCR18 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-06 - Filed with Secretary of State.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-06 - Filed with Secretary of State.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Recognizes and honors Gary Neal for his service to Port of Morrow and State of Oregon.
Title
Recognizing and honoring Gary Neal for his service to the Port of Morrow and the State of Oregon.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-30 - Senate - Senate Final Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - Senate - Senate Committee Be adopted (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - House - House Special Order (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - House - House Committee Be Adopted (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - Senate - Senate Committee Be adopted (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - House - House Special Order (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - House - House Committee Be Adopted (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-06 | House | Filed with Secretary of State. |
2019-05-03 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-05-01 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Final reading. Carried by Hansell. Adopted. Ayes, 28; Excused, 2--Girod, Winters. |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Second reading. |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Recommendation: Be adopted. |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Referred to Rules. |
2019-04-08 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2019-04-04 | House | Read as Special Order of Business. Carried by Smith G. Adopted. Ayes, 57; Excused, 2--Keny-Guyer, McKeown; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Smith Warner. |
2019-03-28 | House | Rules suspended. Made a Special Order of Business on April 4, 2019 Calendar. |
2019-03-27 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to March 28, 2019 Calendar. |
2019-03-26 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to March 27, 2019 Calendar. |
2019-03-25 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to March 26, 2019 Calendar. |
2019-03-21 | House | Recommendation: Be adopted. |
2019-03-18 | House | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2019-02-15 | House | Referred to Rules. |
2019-02-13 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |