OR HB4109 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 32-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 20 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-08 - At Desk upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibits aerial pesticide applicator from spraying or otherwise applying by aircraft pesticide product containing chlorpyrifos. Prohibits person from applying pesticide product containing chlorpyrifos within 300 feet of campus of school. Requires person that employs worker to take steps to ensure that worker does not enter into area in which pesticide product containing chlorpyrifos was applied within eight preceding calendar days. Effective January 1, 2022, prohibits sale, purchase or use of pesticide product containing chlorpyrifos. Requires State Department of Agriculture to revoke, on January 1, 2022, pesticide registrations for pesticide products containing chlorpyrifos. Declares emergency, effective on passage.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to prevention of health impacts from exposure to chlorpyrifos; declaring an emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - House - House Motion to substitute Minority Report (Y: 25 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2020-02-13 - House - House Committee Do pass (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-08SenateAt Desk upon adjournment.
2020-02-27SenateRecommendation: Do pass.
2020-02-25SenatePublic Hearing and Work Session held.
2020-02-21SenatePublic Hearing held.
2020-02-20SenateReferred to Environment and Natural Resources.
2020-02-20SenateFirst reading. Referred to President's desk.
2020-02-19HouseVote explanation(s) filed by McLain, Mitchell, Sollman, Wilde, Williams.
2020-02-19HouseThird reading. Carried by Holvey. Passed. Ayes, 32; Nays, 24--Barreto, Bonham, Boshart Davis, Breese-Iverson, Drazan, Helt, Leif, Lewis, McKeown, McLain, Moore-Green, Nearman, Noble, Owens, Post, Reschke, Smith DB, Smith G, Sprenger, Stark, Wallan, Williams, Wilson, Zika; Excused, 4--Clem, Gorsek, Greenlick, Hayden.
2020-02-19HouseMotion to substitute Minority Report for Committee Report failed. Ayes, 25; Nays, 30--Alonso Leon, Barker, Bynum, Doherty, Evans, Fahey, Gomberg, Helm, Hernandez, Holvey, Keny-Guyer, Lawrence Spence, Lively, Marsh, Meek, Mitchell, Nathanson, Neron, Nosse, Piluso, Power, Prusak, Rayfield, Reardon, Salinas, Sanchez, Schouten, Smith Warner, Speaker Kotek, Wilde; Absent, 1--Nearman; Excused, 3--Clem, Gorsek, Greenlick; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Hayden.
2020-02-18HouseSecond reading.
2020-02-18HouseMinority Recommendation: Do pass with amendments to the bill and be printed A-Engrossed.
2020-02-18HouseRecommendation: Do pass.
2020-02-13HouseWork Session held.
2020-02-11HousePublic Hearing and Work Session held.
2020-02-03HouseReferred to Health Care.
2020-02-03HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
2020-01-27HousePresession Released to the Public.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback