OR HB2953 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on September 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-25 - Chapter 242, (2021 Laws): Effective date January 01, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on September 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-25 - Chapter 242, (2021 Laws): Effective date January 01, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies definition of "community-based structured housing." Specifies that Oregon Health Authority has regulatory authority over community-based structured housing. Modifies definition of "community-based structured housing." Specifies that Oregon Health Authority has regulatory authority over community-based structured housing.
Title
Relating to community-based structured housing.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-02 - House - House Third Reading in Concurrence (Y: 35 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 23 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-05-18 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-12 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 23 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-05-18 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-12 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-25 | House | Chapter 242, (2021 Laws): Effective date January 01, 2022. |
2021-06-11 | House | Governor signed. |
2021-06-07 | Senate | President signed. |
2021-06-04 | House | Speaker signed. |
2021-06-02 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments and repassed bill. Ayes, 35; Nays, 23--Bonham, Boshart Davis, Breese-Iverson, Cate, Drazan, Hayden, Leif, Levy, Lewis, Moore-Green, Morgan, Nearman, Noble, Owens, Post, Reschke, Smith DB, Smith G, Stark, Wallan, Weber, Wright, Zika; Excused, 2--Clem, Smith Warner. |
2021-06-01 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Frederick. Passed. Ayes, 23; Nays, 4--Boquist, Findley, Girod, Robinson; Excused, 3--Heard, Kennemer, Thatcher. |
2021-05-28 | Senate | Second reading. |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng. bill. (Printed B-Eng.) |
2021-05-18 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Referred to Human Services, Mental Health and Recovery. |
2021-04-14 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2021-04-12 | House | Third reading. Carried by McLain. Passed. Ayes, 57; Excused, 3--Bynum, Clem, Levy. |
2021-04-10 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 12, 2021 Calendar. |
2021-04-09 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 10, 2021 Calendar. |
2021-04-08 | House | Carried over to April 9, 2021 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2021-04-07 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 8, 2021 Calendar. |
2021-04-06 | House | Carried over to April 7, 2021 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2021-04-05 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 6, 2021 Calendar. |
2021-04-01 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 5, 2021 Calendar. |
2021-03-31 | House | Second reading. |
2021-03-29 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2021-03-25 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-03-18 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-01-26 | House | Referred to Housing. |
2021-01-21 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |