OR HB2602 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-0)
Status: Failed on July 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-06 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-0)
Status: Failed on July 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-06 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies criteria to qualify for grant to be used to provide instructional time during summer program. Sunsets grant program June 30, 2017. Declares emergency, effective July 1, 2015.
Title
Relating to grants to provide instructional time during a summer program at low-performing Title I schools; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-23 - House - House Committee Do pass. Refer to Ways and Means (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-06 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2015-02-26 | House | Referred to Ways and Means by order of Speaker. |
2015-02-26 | House | Recommendation: Do pass and be referred to Ways and Means. |
2015-02-23 | House | Work Session held. |
2015-02-18 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2015-01-16 | House | Referred to Education. |
2015-01-12 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |