OR HB2462 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on June 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-21 - Chapter 156, (2017 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on June 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-21 - Chapter 156, (2017 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Increases amount by which vehicle equipped with fully functional idle reduction system designed to reduce fuel use and emissions from engine idling may exceed maximum weight limitations. Provides limited exemption from maximum weight limitations for vehicle that uses natural gas as its fuel source.
Title
Relating to exemptions from maximum vehicle weight limitations.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2017-05-16 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 25 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-10 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-02-24 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-10 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-02-24 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-21 | House | Chapter 156, (2017 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2018. |
2017-05-25 | House | Governor signed. |
2017-05-22 | Senate | President signed. |
2017-05-18 | House | Speaker signed. |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Girod. Passed.Ayes, 25; nays, 4--Baertschiger Jr, Hansell, Kruse, Thatcher; excused, 1--Olsen. |
2017-05-15 | Senate | Second reading. |
2017-05-15 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Referred to Business and Transportation. |
2017-03-08 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2017-03-07 | House | Third reading. Carried by Vial. Passed.Ayes, 56; Nays, 1--Rayfield; Excused, 3--Evans, Sprenger, Stark. |
2017-03-06 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to March 7, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-03-02 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to March 6, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-03-01 | House | Second reading. |
2017-02-28 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2017-02-24 | House | Work Session held. |
2017-02-10 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2017-01-17 | House | Referred to Transportation Policy. |
2017-01-09 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |