OR HB2119 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 19-0)
Status: Failed on June 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-25 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 19-0)
Status: Failed on June 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-25 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Repeals corporate activity tax. Repeals corporate activity tax. Applies to tax years beginning on or after January 1, 2024. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to the elimination of the corporate activity tax; prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-18 - House - House Withdraw from Committee (Y: 23 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-25 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2023-04-18 | House | Motion to withdraw from Revenue failed. Ayes, 23; Nays, 35--Andersen, Bowman, Bynum, Chaichi, Dexter, Evans, Fahey, Gamba, Gomberg, Grayber, Hartman, Helm, Holvey, Hudson, Kropf, Levy E, Lively, Marsh, McLain, Nathanson, Nelson, Neron, Nguyen D, Nguyen H, Nosse, Pham H, Pham K, Reynolds, Ruiz, Sanchez, Sosa, Tran, Valderrama, Walters, Speaker Rayfield; Excused, 2--Osborne, Wallan. |
2023-01-11 | House | Referred to Revenue. |
2023-01-09 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |