OK SB953 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-16 - Approved by Governor 05/16/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Child Abuse Multidisciplinary Account; modifying disbursement procedures for certain funds. Emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Child Abuse Multidisciplinary Account; modifying disbursement procedures for certain funds. Emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-09 - Senate - Senate: FOURTH READING (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 81 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Human Services Subcommittee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-16SenateApproved by Governor 05/16/2019
2019-05-13SenateSent to Governor
2019-05-13HouseSigned, returned to Senate
2019-05-13SenateEnrolled, to House
2019-05-09SenateReferred for enrollment
2019-05-09SenateMeasure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 46 Nays: 0
2019-05-09SenateHAs adopted
2019-04-22SenateHAs read
2019-04-18HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2019-04-17HouseReferred for engrossment
2019-04-17HouseThird Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 81 Nays: 0
2019-04-17HouseAmended
2019-04-17HouseGeneral Order
2019-04-04HouseEmergency added
2019-04-04HouseCoauthored by Representative(s) McEntire
2019-04-04HouseRemove Representative McEntire as principal House author and substitute with Representative Lawson
2019-04-04HouseCR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee
2019-03-28HouseRecommendation to the full committee; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Human Services Subcommittee
2019-03-20HouseReferred to Appropriations and Budget Human Services Subcommittee
2019-03-19HouseSecond Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
2019-03-12HouseFirst Reading
2019-03-12SenateEngrossed to House
2019-03-11SenateReferred for engrossment
2019-03-11SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 46 Nays: 0
2019-03-11SenateTitle restored
2019-03-11SenateGeneral Order, Amended
2019-02-27SenateTitle stricken
2019-02-27SenateReported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed
2019-02-21SenateCoauthored by Representative McEntire (principal House author)
2019-02-19SenateReferred to Appropriations
2019-02-19SenateReported Do Pass Judiciary committee; CR filed
2019-02-11SenateSecond Reading referred to Judiciary Committee then to Appropriations Committee
2019-02-04SenateAuthored by Senator Smalley
2019-02-04SenateFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.oklegislature.gov/BillInfo.aspx?Bill=sb953&Session=1900
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20INT/SB/SB953%20INT.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20FLR/SFLR/SB953%20SFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20ENGR/SB/SB953%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20COMMITTEE%20SUBS/HCSS/SB953%20HCS.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20FLR/HFLR/SB953%20HFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20AMENDMENTS/Amendment%20&%20Engr/SB953%20HASB%20&%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20ENR/SB/SB953%20ENR.PDF
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2019-20%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/Senate/SB953_VOTES.HTM
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2019-20%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/House/SB953_VOTES.HTM

Bill Comments

feedback