OK SB903 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB903
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-01 - CR; Do Pass Tourism Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-01 - CR; Do Pass Tourism Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Oklahoma Tourism Development Act; modifying term of certain agreement; increasing term of agreement for certain businesses on certain date. Effective date.
Title
Oklahoma Tourism Development Act; modifying term of certain agreement; increasing term of agreement for certain businesses on certain date. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-31 - House - House: Tourism Committee: DO PASS (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 43 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Business, Commerce And Tourism: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 43 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Business, Commerce And Tourism: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-01 | House | CR; Do Pass Tourism Committee |
2021-03-22 | House | Second Reading referred to Tourism |
2021-03-10 | House | First Reading |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 1 |
2021-03-09 | Senate | General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Echols (principal House author) |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Business and Commerce committee; CR filed |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Business, Commerce and Tourism |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Authored by Senator Leewright |
2021-02-01 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB903 (Carry Over) 2021-04-01 - CR; Do Pass Tourism Committee