OK SB895 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-03-29 - Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
Pending: House Appropriations and Budget Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

State audits; allowing for state agencies to choose public audit. Effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State audits; allowing for state agencies to choose public audit. Effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-14 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 4 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-03-09 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 36 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Appropriations: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 15 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Committee On General Government: DO PASS and referred to second committee (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-29HouseSecond Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
2021-03-10HouseFirst Reading
2021-03-10SenateEngrossed to House
2021-03-09SenateReferred for engrossment
2021-03-09SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 36 Nays: 9
2021-03-09SenateGeneral Order, Amended
2021-03-03SenateReported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations committee; CR filed
2021-02-18SenateReferred to Appropriations
2021-02-18SenateReported Do Pass General Government committee; CR filed
2021-02-03SenateCoauthored by Representative Kannady (principal House author)
2021-02-02SenateReferred to General Government
2021-02-02SenateWithdrawn from Finance committee
2021-02-02SenateSecond Reading referred to Finance Committee then to Appropriations Committee
2021-02-01SenateAuthored by Senator Rosino
2021-02-01SenateFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.oklegislature.gov/BillInfo.aspx?Bill=sb895&Session=2100
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20INT/SB/SB895%20INT.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20COMMITTEE%20SUBS/SCS/SB895%20CS.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20FLR/SFLR/SB895%20SFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20ENGR/SB/SB895%20ENGR.PDF
Amendmenthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20COMMITTEE%20AMENDMENTS/Senate/SB895%20PCS.PDF
Amendmenthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20FLOOR%20AMENDMENTS/Senate/SB895%20(3-08-21)%20(HOWARD)%20FA1.PDF
Amendmenthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20COMMITTEE%20AMENDMENTS/House/SB895%20FULLAMD1%20CHRIS%20KANNADY-LRB.PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/BILLSUM/Senate/SB895%20INT%20BILLSUM.PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/impact%20statements/fiscal/senate/SB895%20INT%20FI.PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/impact%20statements/fiscal/Senate/SB895%20INT%20FI.PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/BILLSUM/House/SB895%20ENGR%20BILLSUM.PDF
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2021-22%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/Senate/SB895_VOTES.HTM
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2021-22%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/House/SB895_VOTES.HTM

Bill Comments

feedback