OK SB870 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-03-30 - Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget General Government Subcommittee
Hearing: Apr 14 @ 3:00 pm in ROOM 450
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

State Auditor and Inspector; deleting certain duties of the Oklahoma Tax Commission; modifying type and frequency of required audit. Effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State Auditor and Inspector; deleting certain duties of the Oklahoma Tax Commission; modifying type and frequency of required audit. Effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-29 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget General Government Subcommittee: DO PASS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Finance: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-30HouseRecommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget General Government Subcommittee
2021-03-23HouseReferred to Appropriations and Budget General Government Subcommittee
2021-03-22HouseSecond Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
2021-03-09HouseFirst Reading
2021-03-09SenateEngrossed to House
2021-03-08SenateReferred for engrossment
2021-03-08SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 46 Nays: 0
2021-03-08SenateGeneral Order, Considered
2021-02-23SenateReported Do Pass Finance committee; CR filed
2021-02-18SenateCoauthored by Representative Pfeiffer (principal House author)
2021-02-02SenateSecond Reading referred to Finance
2021-02-01SenateAuthored by Senator Rader
2021-02-01SenateFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.oklegislature.gov/BillInfo.aspx?Bill=sb870&Session=2100
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20INT/SB/SB870%20INT.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20FLR/SFLR/SB870%20SFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20ENGR/SB/SB870%20ENGR.PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/BILLSUM/Senate/SB870%20INT%20BILLSUM.PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/impact%20statements/fiscal/senate/SB870%20INT%20FI.PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/impact%20statements/fiscal/senate/SB870%20ENGR%20FI.PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/BILLSUM/House/SB870%20ENGR%20BILLSUM.PDF
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2021-22%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/Senate/SB870_VOTES.HTM
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2021-22%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/House/SB870_VOTES.HTM

Bill Comments

feedback