OK SB861 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB861
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on May 8 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-17 - Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Joint Committee on Appropriations and Budget committee; JCR filed
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 8 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-17 - Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Joint Committee on Appropriations and Budget committee; JCR filed
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Sales tax; excluding specified entities from eligibility for exemption on or after certain date. Effective date. Emergency.
Title
Sales tax; excluding specified entities from eligibility for exemption on or after certain date. Effective date. Emergency.
Sponsors
Rep. Leslie Osborn [R] | Sen. Kim David [R] | Sen. Eddie Fields [R] | Rep. John Bennett [R] |
Rep. Mark McBride [R] | Rep. Kevin Wallace [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-15 - House - House: Joint Committee on Appropriations and Budget: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 15 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-17 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Joint Committee on Appropriations and Budget committee; JCR filed |
2017-05-16 | Senate | coauthored by Bennett (John) |
2017-05-15 | Senate | coauthored by McBride |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Joint Committee on Appropriations and Budget |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Wallace |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Osborn (Leslie) (principal House author) |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Fields |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Authored by Senator David |
2017-05-08 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB861 (Carry Over) 2017-05-17 - Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Joint Committee on Appropriations and Budget committee; JCR filed