OK SB861 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB861
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 24-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-21 - Second Reading, direct to Joint Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-21 - Second Reading, direct to Joint Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Income tax; providing for refund of certain credits for specified years. Conditional effective date.
Title
Income tax; providing for refund of certain credits for specified years. Conditional effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-14 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 42 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-15 - House - House: Joint Committee on Appropriations and Budget: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 15 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-15 - House - House: Joint Committee on Appropriations and Budget: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 15 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-21 | House | Second Reading, direct to Joint Calendar |
2018-03-15 | House | First Reading |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 4 |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Emergency removed |
2018-03-14 | Senate | General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute |
2018-03-14 | Senate | JCR adopted |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Thompson, Schulz, Bice, Pemberton, Dugger, Sharp, Griffin, Quinn, Fry, Treat, McCortney, Smalley, Simpson, Yen, Stanislawski, Leewright, Pederson, Bergstrom |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Joint Committee on Appropriations and Budget committee; JCR filed |
2017-05-16 | Senate | coauthored by Bennett (John) |
2017-05-15 | Senate | coauthored by McBride |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Joint Committee on Appropriations and Budget |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Wallace |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Osborn (Leslie) (principal House author) |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Fields |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Authored by Senator David |
2017-05-08 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB861 (Carry Over) 2017-05-17 - Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Joint Committee on Appropriations and Budget committee; JCR filed