OK SB854 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-04-07 - Enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Home food processing; creating the Home Food Processing Act; adding places where certain food may be sold. Effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Home food processing; creating the Home Food Processing Act; adding places where certain food may be sold. Effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-07 - House - House: Public Health Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE E NACTING CLAUSE (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-04 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 44 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Agriculture And Wildlife: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-07HouseEnacting clause stricken
2021-04-07HouseCoauthored by Senator(s) Bergstrom
2021-04-07HouseCR; Do Pass, as amended, Public Health Committee
2021-03-22HouseSecond Reading referred to Public Health
2021-03-08HouseFirst Reading
2021-03-08SenateEngrossed to House
2021-03-04SenateReferred for engrossment
2021-03-04SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 1
2021-03-04SenateGeneral Order, Considered
2021-03-02SenateCoauthored by Senator Hamilton
2021-02-18SenateCoauthored by Representative CrosswhiteHader (principal House author)
2021-02-08SenateTitle stricken
2021-02-08SenateReported Do Pass as amended Agriculture and Wildlife committee; CR filed
2021-02-02SenateSecond Reading referred to Agriculture and Wildlife
2021-02-01SenateAuthored by Senator Dahm
2021-02-01SenateFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.oklegislature.gov/BillInfo.aspx?Bill=sb854&Session=2100
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20INT/SB/SB854%20INT.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20FLR/SFLR/SB854%20SFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20ENGR/SB/SB854%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20FLR/HFLR/SB854%20HFLR.PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/BILLSUM/Senate/SB854%20INT%20BILLSUM.PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/BILLSUM/House/SB854%20ENGR%20BILLSUM.PDF
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2021-22%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/Senate/SB854_VOTES.HTM
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2021-22%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/House/SB854_VOTES.HTM

Bill Comments

feedback