OK SB851 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 20 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-22 - Motion expired
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 20 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-22 - Motion expired
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Office of Juvenile Affairs; providing for classification and unclassification of certain positions. Effective date. Emergency.
Title
Office of Juvenile Affairs; providing for classification and unclassification of certain positions. Effective date. Emergency.
Sponsors
Sen. Clark Jolley [R] | Rep. Earl Sears [R] | Rep. Dennis Casey [R] | Sen. Greg Treat [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-05-22 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 21 N: 70 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2015-05-20 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 39 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-05-18 - House - House: Joint Committee on Appropriations and Budget Committee Meeting: DO PASS (Y: 12 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-20 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 39 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-05-18 - House - House: Joint Committee on Appropriations and Budget Committee Meeting: DO PASS (Y: 12 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-22 | House | Motion expired |
2015-05-22 | House | Notice served to reconsider vote by Representative Nelson |
2015-05-22 | House | Third Reading, Measure failed: Ayes: 21 Nays: 70 |
2015-05-22 | House | JCR adopted |
2015-05-22 | House | General Order |
2015-05-21 | House | Second Reading, direct to Joint Calendar |
2015-05-20 | House | First Reading |
2015-05-20 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2015-05-20 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2015-05-20 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 39 Nays: 7 |
2015-05-20 | Senate | JCR adopted |
2015-05-19 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Joint Committee on Appropriations and Budget committee; JCR filed |
2015-05-15 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Joint Committee on Appropriations and Budget |
2015-05-14 | Senate | coauthored by Casey |
2015-05-14 | Senate | coauthored by Sears (principal House author) |
2015-05-14 | Senate | coauthored by Treat |
2015-05-14 | Senate | Authored by Senator Jolley |
2015-05-14 | Senate | First Reading |