OK SB843 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB843
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 19-2)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-02 - Coauthored by Senator Murdock
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-02 - Coauthored by Senator Murdock
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Daylight savings time; establishing daylight saving time as standard time in Oklahoma. Effective date.
Title
Daylight savings time; establishing daylight saving time as standard time in Oklahoma. Effective date.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-02 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Murdock |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Referred to Rules |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Withdrawn from General Government committee |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Wallace |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Standridge |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Moore |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Rosecrants |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Stinson |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Burns |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative McDugle |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Merrick |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Weaver |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Pemberton |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Humphrey |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Bergstrom |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Bashore |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Boren |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Hardin (David) |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Newhouse |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative West (Josh) (principal House author) |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Jett |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Hamilton |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Second Reading referred to General Government |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Authored by Senator Stephens |
2021-02-01 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB843 (Carry Over) 2021-02-02 - Second Reading referred to General Government