OK SB818 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-11 - Second Reading referred to Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-11 - Second Reading referred to Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Insurance; modifying various provisions relating to the Oklahoma Captive Insurance Company Act. Effective date.
Title
Insurance; modifying various provisions relating to the Oklahoma Captive Insurance Company Act. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-09 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-11 | House | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2015-03-10 | House | First Reading |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2015-03-09 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2015-03-09 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 0 |
2015-03-09 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2015-03-04 | Senate | coauthored by Mulready (principal House author) |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Remove as author Senator Brown authored by Insurance Committee |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Insurance committee; CR filed |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Insurance |
2015-02-09 | Senate | Authored by Senator Brown |
2015-02-09 | Senate | First Reading |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
36 | 6470 | 10 | New Code | See Bill Text |
36 | 6470 | 12 | New Code | See Bill Text |
36 | 6470 | 15 | New Code | See Bill Text |
36 | 6470 | 16 | New Code | See Bill Text |
36 | 6470 | 19 | New Code | See Bill Text |
36 | 6470 | 2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
36 | 6470 | 20 | New Code | See Bill Text |
36 | 6470 | 23 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
36 | 6470 | 25 | New Code | See Bill Text |
36 | 6470 | 27 | New Code | See Bill Text |
36 | 6470 | 29 | New Code | See Bill Text |
36 | 6470 | 3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
36 | 6470 | 30 | New Code | See Bill Text |
36 | 6470 | 34 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
36 | 6470 | 6 | New Code | See Bill Text |