OK SB757 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB757
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-22 - Second Reading referred to Alcohol, Tobacco and Controlled Substances
Pending: House Alcohol, Tobacco, and Controlled Substances Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-22 - Second Reading referred to Alcohol, Tobacco and Controlled Substances
Pending: House Alcohol, Tobacco, and Controlled Substances Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Alcoholic beverage licensee delivery; providing for third-party vendor to deliver alcoholic beverage products from certain licensees. Effective date. Emergency.
Title
Alcoholic beverage licensee delivery; providing for third-party vendor to deliver alcoholic beverage products from certain licensees. Effective date. Emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-11 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 30 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Business, Commerce And Tourism: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Business, Commerce And Tourism: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-22 | House | Second Reading referred to Alcohol, Tobacco and Controlled Substances |
2021-03-15 | House | First Reading |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Emergency failed: Ayes: 24 Nays: 22 |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 30 Nays: 16 |
2021-03-11 | Senate | General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative McEntire (principal House author) |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Title stricken |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Business and Commerce committee; CR filed |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Business, Commerce and Tourism |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Authored by Senator Pugh |
2021-02-01 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB757 (Carry Over) 2021-03-22 - Second Reading referred to Alcohol, Tobacco and Controlled Substances